Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18242 Week
» 71258 Month
» 190785 Year
» 3217638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1158 |
m/e |
11/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9332 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
British Railways |
49332 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 11/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/07/1950 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1918 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2E |
|
Warwick |
w/e |
31/01/1948 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
2F |
|
Coventry |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/07/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2E |
Warwick |
w/e |
31/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Coventry |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/07/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1158 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9332 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
31/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2E) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49332 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2F) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
29/07/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49332 |
|
|