Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 944 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14350 Week
» 67366 Month
» 186893 Year
» 3213746 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9536 |
on |
25/07/1929 |
British Railways |
49536 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Fri 25/07/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 18/10/1957 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/07/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9536 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49536 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
10/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49536 |
|
|