Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 331 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 10147 Month
» 137590 Year
» 1802966 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9564 on 05/10/1929
British Railways 49564 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 05/10/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/09/1949
Service Life 19 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/10/1929
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 24/09/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 23B Aintree w/e 19/04/1947
WDN   w/e 24/09/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/10/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9564
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49564    
1949 Scrapped Scrapped    
24/09/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 49564    

prev prev