Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1469 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19272 Week
» 72288 Month
» 191815 Year
» 3218668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9566 |
on |
09/10/1929 |
British Railways |
49566 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Thu 09/10/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 15/08/1957 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
09/10/1929 |
23B |
|
Aintree |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/08/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
23B |
Aintree |
w/e |
19/04/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/10/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9566 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49566 |
|
|
15/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49566 |
|
|
11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|