Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 300 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2001 Week
» 10116 Month
» 137559 Year
» 1802935 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9566 on 09/10/1929
British Railways 49566 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Thu 09/10/1929
Withdrawal Thu 15/08/1957
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/10/1929
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 15/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 23B Aintree w/e 19/04/1947
WDN   w/e 17/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/10/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9566
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49566    
15/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 49566    
11/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev