Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 329 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2030 Week
» 10145 Month
» 137588 Year
» 1802964 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9567 on 21/10/1929
British Railways 49567 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Thu 21/10/1929
Withdrawal Thu 19/01/1950
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 11/03/1950

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/10/1929
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 19/01/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 11/02/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9567
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49567    
19/01/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49567    
11/03/1950 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev