Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 340 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2041 Week
» 10156 Month
» 137599 Year
» 1802975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9571 on 23/10/1929
British Railways 49571 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 23/10/1929
Withdrawal Sat 02/06/1951
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 22/06/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/10/1929
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25A   Wakefield w/e 25/12/1948
23B   Aintree w/e 15/10/1949
     Withdrawn on 02/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 23B Aintree w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 15/10/1949
WDN   w/e 02/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1946 New LMS Districts New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. SLS/194606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/10/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9571
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
15/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (23B)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49571    
02/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 49571    
22/06/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev