Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2247 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20050 Week
» 73066 Month
» 192593 Year
» 3219446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9583 |
on |
20/11/1929 |
British Railways |
49583 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Wed 20/11/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 23/08/1950 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 01/09/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/11/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9583 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49583 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
23/08/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49583 |
|
|
01/09/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|