Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 282 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1983 Week
» 10098 Month
» 137541 Year
» 1802917 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9589 on 06/12/1929
British Railways 49589 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 06/12/1929
Withdrawal Sat 09/06/1951
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 20/07/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/12/1929
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D   Mirfield w/e 29/05/1948
26C   Bolton m/e 31/12/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 24/02/1951
27B   Aintree m/e 28/02/1951
     Withdrawn on 09/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 26C Bolton m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree m/e 28/02/1951
WDN   w/e 09/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/12/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9589
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49589    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
09/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 49589    
20/07/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev