Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 504 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5491 Week
» 13606 Month
» 141049 Year
» 1806425 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9592 on 12/12/1929
British Railways 49592 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 12/12/1929
Withdrawal Sat 16/05/1959
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/12/1929
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 24/02/1951
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) m/e 28/02/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 11/08/1951
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 15/09/1951
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 06/10/1951
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 10/09/1955
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 28/12/1957
     Withdrawn on 16/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 23B Aintree w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC LMR   4w/e 28/12/1957
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   w/e 16/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/12/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9592
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49592    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
16/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49592    
09/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev