Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 308 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2009 Week
» 10124 Month
» 137567 Year
» 1802943 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9595 on 17/12/1929
British Railways 49595 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 17/12/1929
Withdrawal Sat 08/12/1951
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 21/12/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/12/1929
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 08/12/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 23B Aintree w/e 19/04/1947
WDN   w/e 08/12/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9595
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49595    
08/12/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 49595    
21/12/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev