Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 274 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1975 Week
» 10090 Month
» 137533 Year
» 1802909 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9597 on 20/12/1929
British Railways 49597 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 20/12/1929
Withdrawal During 05/1949
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/12/1929
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 23B Aintree w/e 19/04/1947
WDN   w/e 14/05/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/08/1949 Crewe Works (Scrap Road) 21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/12/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9597
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49597 but not taken up    
05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9597    
07/1949 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev