Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 403 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18206 Week
» 71222 Month
» 190749 Year
» 3217602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9598 |
on |
21/12/1929 |
British Railways |
49598 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 21/12/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/01/1959 |
Service Life |
29 yrs , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9598 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49598 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49598 |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|