Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 288 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1989 Week
» 10104 Month
» 137547 Year
» 1802923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9603 on 06/01/1931
British Railways 49603 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 06/01/1931
Withdrawal Sat 03/03/1956
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 24/03/1956

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/01/1931
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 4w/e 09/09/1950
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 23/02/1952
     Withdrawn on 03/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   w/e 03/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/01/1931 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9603
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49603    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
03/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 49603    
24/03/1956 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev