Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 335 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2036 Week
» 10151 Month
» 137594 Year
» 1802970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9613 on 06/03/1931
British Railways 49613 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Thu 06/03/1931
Withdrawal During 07/1949
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1950

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/03/1931
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25A   Wakefield w/e 24/07/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 07/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 13/12/1947
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 24/07/1948
WDN   w/e 09/07/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1946 New LMS Districts New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. SLS/194606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/03/1931 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9613
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
24/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49613 but not taken up    
07/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9613    
02/1950 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev