Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 299 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2000 Week
» 10115 Month
» 137558 Year
» 1802934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9617 on 07/04/1931
British Railways 49617 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 07/04/1931
Withdrawal Sat 16/06/1951
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Thu 16/09/1954

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/04/1931
24C   Lostock Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 14/05/1949
27B   Aintree 4w/e 09/09/1950
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 14/05/1949
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 09/09/1950
WDN   w/e 16/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1946 New LMS Districts New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. SLS/194606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/04/1931 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9617
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49617    
14/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
16/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 49617    
16/09/1954 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev