Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 335 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2036 Week
» 10151 Month
» 137594 Year
» 1802970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9620 on 30/10/1931
British Railways 49620 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 30/10/1931
Withdrawal Sat 28/01/1956
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 25/02/1956

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/10/1931
25D   Mirfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 31/03/1951
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 19/05/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 05/09/1953
     Withdrawn on 28/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 05/09/1953
WDN   w/e 28/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1943 Crewe Works Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. SLS/194401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1931 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9620
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49620    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 49620    
25/02/1956 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev