Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1032 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18835 Week
» 71851 Month
» 191378 Year
» 3218231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9621 |
on |
02/11/1931 |
British Railways |
49621 |
on |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Wed 02/11/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/01/1950 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 03/03/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
02/11/1931 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/01/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9621 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49621 but not taken up |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
25/01/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9621 |
|
|
03/03/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|