Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3953 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17359 Week
» 70375 Month
» 189902 Year
» 3216755 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9630 |
on |
14/12/1931 |
British Railways |
49630 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 14/12/1931 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/03/1949 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
14/12/1931 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9630 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49630 |
|
|
1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49630 |
|
|