Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 281 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1982 Week
» 10097 Month
» 137540 Year
» 1802916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9631 on 17/12/1931
British Railways 49631 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 17/12/1931
Withdrawal Sat 28/04/1951
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 11/05/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/12/1931
26B   Agecroft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25A   Wakefield w/e 09/10/1948
25G   Farnley Junction w/e 22/10/1949
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 19/11/1949
27B   Aintree w/e 10/06/1950
27B   Aintree 2w/e 17/06/1950
     Withdrawn on 28/04/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 19/11/1949
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 10/06/1950
WDN   w/e 28/04/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1931 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9631
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49631    
09/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
22/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
19/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/04/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 49631    
11/05/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev