Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 334 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2035 Week
» 10150 Month
» 137593 Year
» 1802969 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9635 m/e 12/1931
British Railways 49635 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 12/1931
Withdrawal Fri 27/10/1950
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 10/11/1950

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1931
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25G   Farnley Junction w/e 22/10/1949
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 19/11/1949
27B   Aintree w/e 10/06/1950
27B   Aintree 2w/e 17/06/1950
     Withdrawn on 27/10/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 19/11/1949
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 10/06/1950
WDN   on 04/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1931 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9635
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49635    
22/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
19/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49635    
10/11/1950 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev