Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 784 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14190 Week
» 67206 Month
» 186733 Year
» 3213586 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9636 |
on |
01/01/1932 |
British Railways |
49636 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Wed 01/01/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/08/1950 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 25/08/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
01/01/1932 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/08/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/01/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9636 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49636 |
|
|
16/08/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49636 |
|
|
25/08/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|