Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 463 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5450 Week
» 13565 Month
» 141008 Year
» 1806384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9637 on 05/01/1932
British Railways 49637 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 05/01/1932
Withdrawal Sat 03/06/1961
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/01/1932
26A   Newton Heath on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 24/02/1951
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) m/e 28/02/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 09/10/1954
26B   Agecroft w/e 06/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 03/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 03/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1960 Fowler 7F 0-8-0 By late March, six Fowler ex-L.M.S.R. Class 7F 0-8-0 locomotives survived in stock, divided between Newton Heath 49508 an 49618(26A), and Agecroft 49505, 49627, 49637 an 49668 (26B). SLS/196006
09/07/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Paint Shop: uM28360M, uM28673M, 48341. Car Shop: uM28311, uM28387M, uM28584M. Works Yard: 12032, 40075/7, 42721/4, 42941/60/2, 44477, 49637, 52182: Moss Side: D4025, 42747, 42839/71/95, 43045, 43920, 44098, 44141, 44242, 47520, 48084, 48268, 48641. Scrap Yard: 51429 intact. Erecting Shop: D4026/7/95-9, 12003, 42774/8/87, 42829/43/97, 43115/39, 44007/60, 44104, 44339, 44432, 44567/82, 48060, 48155, 48200/9/50, 48329/70, 48464/72, 48501, 48615/98, 48740, Wren. Works Shunters: 11304/24/68, 47402/29. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/01/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9637
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49637    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
03/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49637    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev