Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 301 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2002 Week
» 10117 Month
» 137560 Year
» 1802936 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9638 on 06/01/1932
British Railways 49638 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 06/01/1932
Withdrawal Sat 23/06/1956
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1956

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/01/1932
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25G   Farnley Junction w/e 22/10/1949
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 19/11/1949
26B   Agecroft w/e 01/07/1950
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 14/10/1950
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 04/11/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 09/10/1954
     Withdrawn on 23/06/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 19/11/1949
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 01/07/1950
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 14/10/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 02/10/1954
WDN   w/e 23/06/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/01/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9638
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49638    
22/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
19/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
01/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
14/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
1956 Scrapped Scrapped    
23/06/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 49638    

prev prev