Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3402 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16808 Week
» 69824 Month
» 189351 Year
» 3216204 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9640 |
on |
28/01/1932 |
British Railways |
49640 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 28/01/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/05/1959 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
28/01/1932 |
24C |
|
Lostock Hall |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26C |
|
Bolton |
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
27B |
|
Aintree |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/05/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9640 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49640 |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49640 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|