Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 675 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19586 Week
» 84540 Month
» 287204 Year
» 3314057 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9664 |
on |
26/05/1932 |
British Railways |
49664 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 26/05/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/02/1957 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 16/02/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
11/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/02/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/05/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9664 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49664 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49664 |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|