Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 308 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2009 Week
» 10124 Month
» 137567 Year
» 1802943 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9665 m/e 06/1932
British Railways 49665 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 06/1932
Withdrawal Mon 14/08/1950
Service Life 18 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 25/08/1950

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1932
26D   Bury on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23B   Aintree w/e 07/01/1950
23B   Aintree 3w/e 14/01/1950
     Withdrawn on 14/08/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 07/01/1950
WDN   w/e 19/08/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9665
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49665    
07/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (23B)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (23B)    
14/08/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49665    
25/08/1950 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev