Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 61 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17864 Week
» 70880 Month
» 190407 Year
» 3217260 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9666 |
m/e |
06/1932 |
British Railways |
49666 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 06/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/04/1956 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 05/05/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1932 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
26D |
|
Bury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/04/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9666 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49666 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
28/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49666 |
|
|
05/05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|