Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 339 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2040 Week
» 10155 Month
» 137598 Year
» 1802974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 114 m/e 03/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12782 y/e 1924
British Railways 52782 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Hoy
Class 392
Company History LYR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
39203/1903
9 (0-8-0)06/1912
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 48
Works Number 841
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Hoy 4' 8" Cgtd (Belpaire firebox)
Reverser Steam Reverse Fitted
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/09/1950
Service Life 47 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1903
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 10/04/1948
     Withdrawn w/e 02/09/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 10/04/1948
WDN   w/e 02/09/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1912 Hughes boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 114
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 841
   
06/1912 Modification Modification: Hughes boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12782    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
10/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52782    
02/09/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 52782    

prev prev