Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4177 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17583 Week
» 70599 Month
» 190126 Year
» 3216979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
114 |
m/e |
03/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12782 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52782 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Hoy |
Class |
392 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
48 |
Works Number |
841 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Hoy 4' 8" Cgtd (Belpaire firebox) | Reverser | Steam Reverse Fitted | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 03/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/09/1950 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1903 |
23B |
|
Aintree |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
23D |
|
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
02/09/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/09/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1912 |
Hughes boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 114 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 841 |
|
|
06/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: Hughes boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12782 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52782 |
|
|
02/09/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52782 |
|
|