Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 308 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2009 Week
» 10124 Month
» 137567 Year
» 1802943 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1562 m/e 05/1913
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12856 y/e 1924
British Railways 52856 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 1546
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 70
Works Number 1190
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Hughes Robinson s/h (Belpaire firebox)
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1950 (R)
Withdrawal Notes R
Service Life 37 yrs , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1913
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 04/06/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 04/06/1949
WDN   w/e 06/05/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1562
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1190
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12856    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
23/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52856    
04/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
06/05/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 52856    

prev prev