Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 298 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1999 Week
» 10114 Month
» 137557 Year
» 1802933 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1576 m/e 11/1913
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12870 y/e 1924
British Railways 52870 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 1546
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 71
Works Number 1204
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Hughes Top/Bottom s/h 20 (Belpaire firebox)
To Service During 11/1913
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/09/1951 (T)
Withdrawal Notes T
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1913
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 10/06/1950
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 2w/e 17/06/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 10/06/1950
WDN   w/e 22/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1913 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1576
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1204
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12870    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52870    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
22/09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 52870    

prev prev