Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17912 Week
» 70928 Month
» 190455 Year
» 3217308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
603 |
m/e |
04/1917 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12910 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52910 |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
1546 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
73 |
Works Number |
1233 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Hughes Top/Bottom s/h 28 (Belpaire firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1917 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/09/1950 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1917 |
23B |
|
Aintree |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
23D |
|
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 603 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1233 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12910 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52910 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52910 |
|
|