|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 08/04/1926 | 15/04/1926 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 05/02/1927 | 29/03/1927 | 53 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2374 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/06/1928 | 20/08/1928 | 76 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4625 (Diagram HA) |
183778 | |
Swindon Works | 05/12/1928 | 18/12/1928 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 03/09/1929 | 02/12/1929 | 91 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 02/12/1930 | 07/02/1931 | 68 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2264 (Collett 3,500g) attached. |
304445 | |
Swindon Works | 15/05/1931 | 13/08/1931 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
321398 | |
Swindon Works | 01/02/1933 | 03/1933 | General | ||||
Swindon Works | 20/02/1934 | 19/04/1934 | 59 days | Intermediate | 492401 | ||
Swindon Works | 07/05/1935 | 03/07/1935 | 58 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
563062 | |
Swindon Works | 07/10/1935 | 10/10/1935 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 21/07/1936 | 06/09/1936 | 48 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
632721 | |
Swindon Works | 01/02/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 76 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/01/1938 | 21/03/1938 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
707564 | |
Swindon Works | 06/09/1938 | 26/09/1938 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 06/06/1939 | 15/08/1939 | 71 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2420 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/03/1940 | 19/04/1940 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 17/05/1941 | 15/08/1941 | 91 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
887085 | |
Swindon Works | 16/06/1942 | 12/07/1942 | 27 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/07/1943 | 27/08/1943 | 52 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/03/1944 | 04/05/1944 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2708 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
982850 | |
Swindon Works | 24/09/1945 | 05/11/1945 | 43 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1051413 | |
Swindon Works | 31/12/1946 | 04/02/1947 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/06/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 25 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2930 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 22/12/1947 | 03/02/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2621 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1137491 | |
Swindon Works | 27/06/1949 | 17/08/1949 | 52 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2810 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1200209 | |
Swindon Works | 15/12/1950 | 05/09/1951 | 265 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4669 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2663 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1283692 | |
Swindon Works | 26/06/1952 | 07/08/1952 | 43 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2575 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 22/09/1952 | 22/10/1952 | 31 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2873 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/04/1953 | 26/05/1953 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2840 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1350901 | |
Swindon Works | 12/06/1953 | 02/07/1953 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 14/01/1954 | 25/02/1954 | 43 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/12/1954 | 04/02/1955 | 52 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4095 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1421708 | |
Swindon Works | 28/08/1956 | 20/12/1956 | 115 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4117 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1500536 | |
Swindon Works | 25/06/1958 | 24/09/1958 | 92 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2721 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1580218 | |
Swindon Works | 15/09/1960 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds | SLS/194803 |
30/06/1949 | Swindon Works (entering Works) | New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1925 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1779 | ||
30/05/1925 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4084, name: ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (LA) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
08/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1926. Dep: 15/04/1926. | ||
05/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1927. Dep: 29/03/1927. Work undertaken: Tender number 2374 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached. |
||
06/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/06/1928. Dep: 20/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4625 (Diagram HA) |
||
05/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1928. Dep: 18/12/1928. | ||
11/07/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2408 | ||
03/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1929. Dep: 02/12/1929. | ||
02/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
23/10/1930 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2419 | ||
02/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/12/1930. Dep: 07/02/1931. Work undertaken: Tender number 2264 (Collett 3,500g) attached. |
||
07/02/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
15/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1931. Dep: 13/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
01/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1933. Dep: ?/03/1933. | ||
03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
17/03/1933 | Modification | Diagram HA number 4628 boiler fitted | ||
20/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1934. Dep: 19/04/1934. | ||
19/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM) | ||
10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
07/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1935. Dep: 03/07/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
07/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1935. Dep: 10/10/1935. | ||
21/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/07/1936. Dep: 06/09/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1938. Dep: 21/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
06/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1938. Dep: 26/09/1938. | ||
06/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/06/1939. Dep: 15/08/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2420 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1940. Dep: 19/04/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1941. Dep: 15/08/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1942. Dep: 12/07/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/1942 | Allocation | |||
10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
20/01/1943 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2587 | ||
05/1943 | Allocation | |||
07/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1943. Dep: 27/08/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
15/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1944. Dep: 04/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2708 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1945. Dep: 05/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/11/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2598 | ||
09/1946 | Allocation | |||
11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
31/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1946. Dep: 04/02/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2930 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
22/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1947. Dep: 03/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2621 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/1948 | Allocation | |||
04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
27/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/06/1949. Dep: 17/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2810 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/12/1950. Dep: 05/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4669 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2663 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410 | ||
25/04/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2424 | ||
26/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/06/1952. Dep: 07/08/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2575 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/08/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing number 4127 | ||
06/09/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2579 | ||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 22/10/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2873 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/04/1953. Dep: 26/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2840 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1953. Dep: 02/07/1953. | ||
14/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 04/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4095 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1956. Dep: 20/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4117 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/03/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4037 | ||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 24/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2721 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
22/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
15/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/09/1960. | ||
11/10/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4084 from Cardiff Canton (88A) | ||
12/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |