Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D409 |
19/03/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50009 |
09/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Conqueror |
08/05/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D409 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50009 |
|
|
04/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Conqueror' at Laira |
|
|
11/01/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50009 |
|
|
26/03/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: at Old Oak Common |
|
|