Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 994 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2068 Week
» 27429 Month
» 260349 Year
» 1925725 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 13 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 409 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 218 on 10/01/1950 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5384
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Thu 04/12/1952
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys
Total Mileage 680,803

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 24/01/1953 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
FDL   Ferndale 4w/e 30/06/1949
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 04/11/1950
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 30/11/1950
88F   Treherbert m/e 31/10/1951
     Withdrawn on 04/12/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert m/e 31/10/1951
WDN   m/e 31/12/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 13
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5384
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 409    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ferndale (FDL)    
10/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 218    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
31/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
04/12/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 218    
24/01/1953 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev