Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1049 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18852 Week
» 71868 Month
» 191395 Year
» 3218248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4099 |
19/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09011 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4099 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
09/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09011 |
|
|