Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 242 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3274 Week
» 21326 Month
» 254246 Year
» 1919622 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4101 on 22/08/1935

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 292
To Service Sat 22/08/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/06/1964
Service Life 28 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/08/1935
TYS   Tyseley 4w/e 23/04/1949
TYS   Tyseley 4w/e 18/06/1949
87B   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 01/11/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 11/08/1956
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/09/1956
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 22/02/1958
84C   Banbury w/e 30/03/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 13/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   w/e 13/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/04/1961 Wolverhampton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1935 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4101
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS)    
18/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
13/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4101    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev