Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 22 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2097 Week
» 27458 Month
» 260378 Year
» 1925754 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4102 on 29/08/1935

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 292
To Service Fri 29/08/1935
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962
Service Life 27 yrs , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/08/1935
84C   Banbury 4w/e 29/12/1951
84C   Banbury 4w/e 31/01/1952
84D   Leamington 4w/e 22/03/1952
84C   Banbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
84D   Leamington 4w/e 30/04/1952
84C   Banbury 3w/e 17/05/1952
84K   Chester West 4w/e 21/05/1955
82C   Swindon 4w/e 09/08/1958
     Withdrawn on 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/08/1935 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4102
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
30/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4102    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev