Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2148 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19951 Week
» 72967 Month
» 192494 Year
» 3219347 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4108 |
23/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09020 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
09 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
23/11/1961 to Stoke (5D) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4108 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
01/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
10/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
03/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
17/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09020 |
|
|