Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 33 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2108 Week
» 27469 Month
» 260389 Year
» 1925765 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4114 on 28/10/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 292
To Service Wed 28/10/1936
Withdrawal Wed 20/11/1963
Service Life 27 yrs , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 28/10/1936
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 09/10/1954
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 8w/e 26/03/1955
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 25/02/1956
83G   Penzance m/e 16/06/1956
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 14/07/1956
     Withdrawn on 20/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 14/07/1956
WDN   w/e 23/11/1963
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/04/1961 Wolverhampton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. SLS/196106
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/10/1936 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4114
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
20/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4114    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev