Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 986 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2060 Week
» 27421 Month
» 260341 Year
» 1925717 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4118 on 13/11/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 292
To Service Wed 13/11/1936
Withdrawal Wed 05/09/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/11/1936
OXF   Oxford 4w/e 07/09/1946
84D   Leamington 4w/e 09/10/1954
     Withdrawn on 05/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAN Banbury 4w/e 22/02/1947
ALLOC SALOP Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/07/1947
ALLOC SALOP Shrewsbury 4w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 09/10/1954
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1948 Swindon Works New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered.
Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn.
SLS/194812
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1936 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4118
Built at Swindon Works
   
07/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (OXF)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
05/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4118    
11/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev