Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 994 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2068 Week
» 27429 Month
» 260349 Year
» 1925725 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4120 on 11/12/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 313
To Service Sat 11/12/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/11/1964
Service Life 26 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/12/1937
84H   Wellington 8w/e 20/04/1957
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1960
84H   Wellington 4w/e 03/12/1960
84A   Stafford Road 4w/e 19/05/1962
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 14/07/1962
84D   Leamington 4w/e 06/10/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 84H Wellington m/e 30/04/1957
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 14/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/07/1961 Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. SLS/196108
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/12/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4120
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
14/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4120    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev