Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4139 11/07/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 08909 09/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0811/07/1962
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 11/07/1962 to Carnforth (24L)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
24L Carnforth (New) on 11/07/1962
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 10/08/1968
10D Lostock Hall w/e 31/10/1970
8J Allerton w/e 14/11/1970
10D Lostock Hall w/e 12/12/1970
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/05/1972
1E Bletchley w/e 20/05/1972
WN Willesden w/e 11/05/1974


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
11/07/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number 4139
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Carnforth (24L)
   
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
31/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
14/11/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
12/12/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (WN)    
09/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08909    

prev prev