Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 258 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 15472 Month
» 248392 Year
» 1913768 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4139 on 05/12/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 323
To Service Tue 05/12/1939
Withdrawal Tue 08/07/1958
Service Life 18 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 01/11/1958 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/12/1939
82A   Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/02/1953
85D   Kidderminster 8w/e 20/04/1957
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/07/1957
     Withdrawn on 08/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/02/1953
LOAN 85D Kidderminster m/e 30/04/1957
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   m/e 31/07/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4139
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
08/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 4139    
01/11/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev