Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 301 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4278 Week
» 15515 Month
» 248435 Year
» 1913811 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 36 m/e 08/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 414 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 219 on 28/05/1948 (At Barry Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2534
To Service During 08/1910
Withdrawal Mon 04/06/1951
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys
Total Mileage 715,156

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 26/01/1952 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1910
     Withdrawn on 04/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 30/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Barry Works On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 36
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2534
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 414    
28/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 219    
04/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 219    
26/01/1952 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev