Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14410 Week
» 67426 Month
» 186953 Year
» 3213806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
36 |
m/e |
08/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
414 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
219 |
on |
28/05/1948 (At Barry Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2534 |
To Service |
During 08/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/06/1951 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
Total Mileage |
715,156 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1910 |
CV.AYN |
|
Abercynon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/06/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Barry Works |
On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 36 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2534 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 414 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
28/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 219 |
|
|
04/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 219 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|