Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 987 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2061 Week
» 27422 Month
» 260342 Year
» 1925718 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4147 on 30/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 335
To Service Sat 30/09/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/10/1965
Service Life 19 yrs , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/09/1946
84A   Stafford Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
81F   Oxford 4w/e 16/05/1953
87E   Landore 4w/e 13/08/1960
81F   Oxford 4w/e 10/09/1960
84G   Kidderminster 4w/e 22/04/1961
2C   Stourbridge Junction w/e 15/08/1964
2A   Tyseley w/e 17/07/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 02/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 05/10/1946
1STALLOC TYS Tyseley m/e 31/10/1946
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 05/09/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 07/08/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1946 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4147
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
02/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4147    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev