30/09/1947 |
General |
The latest batch of 41XX 2-6-2T have been noted in many places. No. 4148 was seen working local trains between Newport and Cardiff and on station pilot duties at Newport. No. 4157 passed through Cheltenham en route to Tyseley and has since worked stopping trains to Leamington. No. 4159 , also allocated to the Wolverhampton Division (CHR) went via Oxford and was noted there on 12/9. Nos. 4156/8 have joined the 2-6-2T allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction for assisting trains through the tunnel. Recent observations in West Wales found Nos. 3654 an 4654 at Milford Haven, the former on the passenger turn to Johnstone. Nos. 7816, 3447 an 4358, were impressively clean at Neyland. Carmarthen produced a number of the smaller types of loco. Nos. 7407 an 2236 on local goods, 2223 on the 6.15 p.m. departure for Aberystwyth and L.M.S. Nos. 6620 an 6740 on the branch trains to Llandovery. No. 5819, once a regular at Newcastle Emlyn was awaiting repair outside the factory. |
SLS/194710 |
31/08/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. |
SLS/194910 |
19/02/1961 |
Swindon Works ('A' Shop) |
Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. |
SLS/196104 |
30/12/1962 |
Western Regionboundary changes |
The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. |
SLS/196303 |