Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 819 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6219 Week
» 24271 Month
» 257191 Year
» 1922567 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4152 on 21/06/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 361
To Service Thu 21/06/1947
Withdrawal Thu 13/09/1962
Service Life 15 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/06/1947
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/12/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1951
88A   Radyr 4w/e 17/05/1958
85A   Worcester 4w/e 06/09/1958
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 26/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 13/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 26/03/1960
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1958 Bristol Bath Road MPD Standard tanks 82035/6/7/9 have moved here from Radyr June. where they have been replaced by GWR4143/52/60/3/4 which have been displaced at Rhymney by diesel railcars. SLS/195807
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/06/1947 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4152
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
13/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4152    
02/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev